LA SB170 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the creation of the office of human trafficking prevention. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the creation of the office of human trafficking prevention. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 170 CONCUR (#656) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#805) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 170 CO-AUTHORS (#172) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#171) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateEffective date 6/17/2021.
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 352.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-27SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-19SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB170&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211119
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213944
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218710
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230632
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235718
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214505
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229223
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211121
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213439
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215213
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218817
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219934
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229528
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235069
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235766
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229286
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230491

Bill Comments

feedback