LA SB17 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date 1/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date 1/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for driver education to include instruction on appropriate driver conduct when stopped by a law enforcement officer. (1/1/18)
Title
Provides for driver education to include instruction on appropriate driver conduct when stopped by a law enforcement officer. (1/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#723) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 17 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2018. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 286. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |