LA SB169 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Effective date 5/24/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires annual meetings of and reports from the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires annual meetings of and reports from the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#955) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateEffective date 5/24/2022.
2022-05-24SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 82.
2022-05-23SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2022.
2022-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2022-05-19SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2022-05-18SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2022-05-18HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2022-05-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
2022-05-09HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2022-05-05HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2022-05-04HouseReported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2022-04-05HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2022-04-04HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2022-04-04SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2022-04-04SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2022-03-22SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2022-03-21SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2022-03-16SenateReported with amendments.
2022-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2022-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback