LA SB169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the statewide immunization registry. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the statewide immunization registry. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#745) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 169 AMENDMENT # 3468 BY DUBUISSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#744) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 169 AMENDMENT # 3285 BY AMEDEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#743) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 169 FINAL PASSAGE (#160) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 192.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 35. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-22HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-29SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB169&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121000
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127063
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128715
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140033
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143899
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127345
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139652
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139943
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139925
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121002
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127579
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128798
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145135
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139944

Bill Comments

feedback