LA SB167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to emergency preparedness plans for nursing homes. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to emergency preparedness plans for nursing homes. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Gary Carter [D] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] |
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] | Sen. Patrick McMath [R] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#1344) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 167 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 597. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |