LA SB166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to physician assistants. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides relative to physician assistants. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 166 FINAL PASSAGE (#829) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 166 FINAL PASSAGE (#328) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 166 FINAL PASSAGE (#328) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 276. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |