LA SB164 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to authorize the phase-in of increases in ad valorem taxation under certain circumstances. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to authorize the phase-in of increases in ad valorem taxation under certain circumstances. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 164 CONCUR (#1050) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 164 FINAL PASSAGE (#999) (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 164 FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 164 FINAL PASSAGE (#999) (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 164 FINAL PASSAGE (#114) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Becomes Act No. 718 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 9. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported without amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-03-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |