LA SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Conforms state partnership reporting adjustments to federal taxable income to current federal partnership audit adjustments. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conforms state partnership reporting adjustments to federal taxable income to current federal partnership audit adjustments. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 CONCUR (#782) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 RECONSIDER (#781) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 REJECT (#449) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#561) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#54) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14SenateEffective date 6/14/2021.
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 287.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
2021-06-07HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2021-06-03HouseNotice Senate has discharged from Conference Committee.
2021-06-03SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-03SenateBy a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-03SenateReconsidered.
2021-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-03SenateSenate Conference Committee members discharged.
2021-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-02SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Bishop, DeVillier, and Riser.
2021-06-02HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Ward, and Lambert.
2021-05-24HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2021-05-24SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-20SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-19HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-12HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-11HouseReported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-19SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 04/20.
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-14SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-13SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB160&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210812
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213571
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215598
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233155
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235424
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213271
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213450
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223103
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223351
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223769
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223932
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210813
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213437
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214017
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215769
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219277
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223879
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215572
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231536
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231537

Bill Comments 750

feedback