LA SB16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain juveniles sentenced to life without parole. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to certain juveniles sentenced to life without parole. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 16 MOTION TO ADOPT (#936) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 16 MOTION TO ADOPT (#932) (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 ADOPT (#917) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 REJECT (#602) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#422) (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#138) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 AMENDMENT # 955 BY MARTINY SB 16 BY CLAITOR (#137) (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 16 MOTION TO ADOPT (#932) (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 ADOPT (#917) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 REJECT (#602) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#422) (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#138) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 AMENDMENT # 955 BY MARTINY SB 16 BY CLAITOR (#137) (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2017. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 277. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 67, nays 35. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Reconsidered. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 46, nays 44. The Conference Committee Report was rejected. |
2017-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Magee, Mack, and Stefanski. |
2017-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Martiny, and Carter. |
2017-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |