LA SB155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Received from the House without amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for payment of supplemental compensation from nonpublic sources for certain personnel at the Jimmy D. Long, Sr. Louisiana School for Math, Science, and the Arts. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for payment of supplemental compensation from nonpublic sources for certain personnel at the Jimmy D. Long, Sr. Louisiana School for Math, Science, and the Arts. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#493) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-05-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback