LA SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for truth in labeling requirements of agricultural products. (10/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for truth in labeling requirements of agricultural products. (10/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 152 FINAL PASSAGE (#90) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback