LA SB151 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Foster Youth's Bill of Rights for youth ages fourteen through eighteen in foster care. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Foster Youth's Bill of Rights for youth ages fourteen through eighteen in foster care. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors

Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]
Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]
Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. John Morris [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [R]
Sen. Mack White [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]
Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Larry Selders [D]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 151 CONCUR (#653) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 151 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 151 CO-AUTHORS (#298) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 151 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateEffective date 6/17/2021.
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 351.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-18HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-06SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-05SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB151&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210742
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221315
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222861
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230591
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221142
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217896
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222406
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225360
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225724
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210743
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213167
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221865
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223055
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221732
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225725
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229636
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231837
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222785
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230486

Bill Comments

feedback