LA SB151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the La. Special Education Center from the Special School District to the Louisiana Department of Health and renames the center. (gov sig) (RE -$75,648 SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers the La. Special Education Center from the Special School District to the Louisiana Department of Health and renames the center. (gov sig) (RE -$75,648 SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 151 FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB151&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120905
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124960
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126104
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124859
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125204
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120907
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124657
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125613
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125621
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126182
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125622
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127057
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126001

Bill Comments

feedback