LA SB150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Office of Group Benefits to cover bariatric surgery techniques for the treatment of severe obesity. (8/1/21) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Office of Group Benefits to cover bariatric surgery techniques for the treatment of severe obesity. (8/1/21) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 150 CONCUR (#975) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 150 FINAL PASSAGE (#974) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 150 CO-AUTHORS (#357) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 150 FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 388.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-06SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
2021-05-26HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-25HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-24HouseReported favorably (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-18HouseReported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-11SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-29SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB150&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210740
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218632
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224181
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233231
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235877
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217862
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218388
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218838
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223990
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225700
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210741
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217947
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219035
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219618
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224351
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225400
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225702
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226782
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231673
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233758
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235903
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224115
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224116
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231592
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233197

Bill Comments

feedback