LA SB142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires doula services to be covered by Medicaid. (8/1/24) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires doula services to be covered by Medicaid. (8/1/24) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#1228) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-05-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |