LA SB14 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Effective date 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Effective date 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the Louisiana New Markets Jobs Act tax credit to certain recovery zones. (gov sig) (Item #65) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Expands the Louisiana New Markets Jobs Act tax credit to certain recovery zones. (gov sig) (Item #65) (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Sen. Patrick McMath [R] | Sen. Mike Reese [R] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on SB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#50) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Senate | Effective date 10/16/2020. |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/8/2020. |
2020-10-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/8/2020. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |