LA SB138 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for sales and use tax collection by marketplace facilitators. (7/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for sales and use tax collection by marketplace facilitators. (7/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 138 CONCUR (#430) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#449) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateEffective date 7/1/2020.
2020-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 216.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-11SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB138&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159338
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170871
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171638
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177263
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181989
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169615
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171333
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171560
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173414
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173467
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175701
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176406
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176644
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159339
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169645
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171342
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171432
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171689
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173365
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173626
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177616
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171616
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177114

Bill Comments

feedback