LA SB138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Effective date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize university logo to be placed on a driver's license or identification card issued by the office of motor vehicles. (1/1/15) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Authorize university logo to be placed on a driver's license or identification card issued by the office of motor vehicles. (1/1/15) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#1258) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#564) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#564) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2015. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 451. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |