LA SB136 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the governance of the Baton Rouge North Economic Development District. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the governance of the Baton Rouge North Economic Development District. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 ADOPT (#1020) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 136 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1217) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 REJECT (#903) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#221) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective date 6/14/2023.
2023-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389.
2023-06-08SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2023-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-08SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2023-06-08SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2023-06-08HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2023-06-08HouseRules suspended.
2023-06-08HouseConference Committee report received.
2023-06-07HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2023-06-07SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Barrow, Henry, and Jackson.
2023-06-07SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2023-06-07HouseHouse conferees appointed: Marcelle, Edmonds, and LaFleur.
2023-06-07HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2023-06-06SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
2023-06-05SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2023-06-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2023-06-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
2023-05-31HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-30HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2023-05-25HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2023-05-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2023-05-08SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-05-02SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-05-01SenateReported favorably.
2023-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs
2023-03-30SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=SB136&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1308860
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1316779
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319875
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331937
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332587
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1317141
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318780
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1325856
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1308861
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318321
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1320027
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326030
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330426
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331857
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1333845
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319805
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330009
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330879
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331869
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331880

Bill Comments

feedback