LA SB136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to wage secrecy and pay discrimination. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides with respect to wage secrecy and pay discrimination. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D] | Rep. Edward James [D] | Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |