LA SB132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the crimes of illegal carrying of a firearm and reckless discharge of a firearm at a parade. (8/1/24) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to the crimes of illegal carrying of a firearm and reckless discharge of a firearm at a parade. (8/1/24) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#115) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |