LA SB132 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for reporting to and approval of all state contracts valued at twenty-five million dollars or more annually by the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget. (7/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for reporting to and approval of all state contracts valued at twenty-five million dollars or more annually by the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget. (7/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 CONCUR (#429) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-11SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB132&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159324
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170898
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171643
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177146
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165715
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170744
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172394
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173704
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173940
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176640
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159326
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171238
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171363
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171684
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171832
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173696
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177354
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181950
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185260
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171613
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176431
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177113

Bill Comments

feedback