LA SB132 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the certain records held by the Board of Gaming Control. (8/1/14)
Title
Provides relative to the certain records held by the Board of Gaming Control. (8/1/14)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#1425) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#516) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#516) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2014. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 683. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-07 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |