LA SB130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for payment of health insurance provider claim payment claims. (8/1/21)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for payment of health insurance provider claim payment claims. (8/1/21)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 CONCUR (#646) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#822) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#239) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-19HouseReported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2021-05-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-29SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-28SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2021-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB130&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209872
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218413
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220683
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230562
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235889
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218326
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217851
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218768
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220339
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225762
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226154
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209874
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219016
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220973
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226155
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229519
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235997
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220627
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229359
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230475

Bill Comments

feedback