LA SB130 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the transmission of transactional information by secondhand dealers to law enforcement. (8/15/11)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the transmission of transactional information by secondhand dealers to law enforcement. (8/15/11)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-24 Effective date 8/15/11.
2011-06-24 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 142.
2011-06-16 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2011-06-15 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-15 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-06-14 Received from the House without amendments.
2011-06-14 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-08 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011.
2011-06-08 Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-07 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2011-06-06 Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-05-24 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2011-05-23 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2011-05-23 Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-05-19 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-05-18 Reported with amendments.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2011-04-14 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback