LA SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a surviving spouse benefit to resume in certain circumstances. (2/3 - CA10s29(F)) (7/1/2019) (EG INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a surviving spouse benefit to resume in certain circumstances. (2/3 - CA10s29(F)) (7/1/2019) (EG INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 13 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-04-16HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback