LA SB129 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a local public school district to enter into an agreement with a higher-performing district to manage and operate one or more of its low-performing schools. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a local public school district to enter into an agreement with a higher-performing district to manage and operate one or more of its low-performing schools. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#699) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#231) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23SenateEffective date 6/23/2015.
2015-06-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 159.
2015-06-05SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2015-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-03SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2015-06-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015.
2015-05-26HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-05-20HouseReported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2015-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-05SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-04SenateReported favorably.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2015-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB129&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934358
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943715
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945645
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954870
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960072
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939275
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945192
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945506
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945808
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948340
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956657
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945600
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954592

Bill Comments

feedback