LA SB129 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Effective date 4/23/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for licensing and regulation of manufacturers, dealer-distributors, users, blasters, and handlers of explosives. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for licensing and regulation of manufacturers, dealer-distributors, users, blasters, and handlers of explosives. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 CONCUR (#389) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23SenateEffective date 4/23/2014.
2014-04-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
2014-04-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2014-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2014-04-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2014-04-15SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-04-14SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2014-04-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2014.
2014-04-10HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-10HouseRules suspended.
2014-04-10HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2014-04-09HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-03-26HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2014-03-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2014-03-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-03-19SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-03-18SenateReported with amendments.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=SB129&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875293
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883221
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885085
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894124
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897042
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883151
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883575
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892297
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892922
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893570
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875299
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=882523
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883932
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=884375
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885132
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885789
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892302
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897177
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=898429
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=904856
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893471
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894074

Bill Comments

feedback