LA SB129 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 6/24/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 6/24/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2 board of commissioners. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2 board of commissioners. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] | Sen. Jack Donahue [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 129, FINAL PASSAGE (#623) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129, FINAL PASSAGE (#217) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129, FINAL PASSAGE (#217) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date 6/24/11. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 141. | |
2011-06-19 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/17. | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-05-18 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-17 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |