LA SB128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits cutting, resection, excision, harvesting, or removal of a body part, organ, or tissue of an aborted unborn child for sale, commerce, transport, research, or profit. (gov sig)
Title
Prohibits cutting, resection, excision, harvesting, or removal of a body part, organ, or tissue of an aborted unborn child for sale, commerce, transport, research, or profit. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 CONCUR (#762) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Effective date 6/14/2017. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 243. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |