LA SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the playing or singing of the national anthem prior to certain athletic contests. (8/1/21)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the playing or singing of the national anthem prior to certain athletic contests. (8/1/21)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 124 CONCUR (#644) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#755) (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#209) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 224.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-26HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 11. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably (8-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-05-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-03SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-28SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-27SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-03-30SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB124&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209335
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217860
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230571
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235361
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228343
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209338
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218685
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228818
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230473

Bill Comments

feedback