LA SB124 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases certain fees and court costs levied by the Criminal District Court for the Parish of Orleans. (2/3-CA7s2.1) (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases certain fees and court costs levied by the Criminal District Court for the Parish of Orleans. (2/3-CA7s2.1) (gov sig) (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 124 FINAL PASSAGE (#655) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 124, FINAL PASSAGE (#43) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17SenateEffective date 6/17/2013.
2013-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 350.
2013-06-03SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2013-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-30SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-29SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2013-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2013-05-29HouseRules suspended. Reconsidered, returned to the calendar..
2013-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2013-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
2013-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2013-05-15HouseReported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-04-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2013-04-16HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2013-04-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-04-10SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-04-09SenateReported favorably.
2013-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2013-03-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=SB124&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833916
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836666
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838175
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852682
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857645
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833918
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836592
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837394
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838229
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839422
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836954
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852973
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=855970
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852629

Bill Comments

feedback