LA SB122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for monies collected from enforcement actions of coastal use permits. (8/1/21) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)
Title
Provides for monies collected from enforcement actions of coastal use permits. (8/1/21) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)
Sponsors
Sen. R. Bret Allain [R] | Sen. Michael Fesi [R] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] | Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R] |
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1524 BY CONNICK ADOPT (#261) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1662 BY WARD ADOPT (#260) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1525 BY LAMBERT ADOPT (#259) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 SB 122 BY ALLAIN (#135) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1524 BY CONNICK ADOPT (#261) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1662 BY WARD ADOPT (#260) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 AMENDMENT # 1525 BY LAMBERT ADOPT (#259) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 122 SB 122 BY ALLAIN (#135) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Notice given. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (9-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | By a vote of 29 yeas and 3 nays. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |