LA SB120 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the minimum premium rate on criminal bail bonds. (8/15/10)
Title
Increases the minimum premium rate on criminal bail bonds. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 120, CONCUR (#940) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 120, FINAL PASSAGE (#1097) (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 120, FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 120, FINAL PASSAGE (#1097) (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 120, FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 162. | |
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/04. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-02 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-05-27 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 12. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 27, 2010. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Insurance. |