LA SB118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides right of an oral argument in contradictory proceedings. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides right of an oral argument in contradictory proceedings. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 6 yeas and 30 nays. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |