LA SB117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date 6/6/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date 6/6/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to postsecondary textbooks and instructional materials. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to postsecondary textbooks and instructional materials. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#825) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117 CO-AUTHOR (#390) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117 CO-AUTHOR (#390) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2019. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 125. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |