LA SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the transfer of certain going-out-of-business sale license deposits to the unclaimed property division of the Department of the Treasury. (7/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the transfer of certain going-out-of-business sale license deposits to the unclaimed property division of the Department of the Treasury. (7/1/19)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback