LA SB114 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for remote public school registration and enrollment of children of military personnel transferring to the state. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for remote public school registration and enrollment of children of military personnel transferring to the state. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 CONCUR (#641) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2021.
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 208.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-26SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-30SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB114&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208927
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216022
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218665
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230564
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235333
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217665
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208938
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217531
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218773
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228817
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235620
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230468

Bill Comments

feedback