LA SB114 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Military Service Relief Act. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Military Service Relief Act. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 CONCUR (#1259) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#1108) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#170) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 647.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-07HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-03HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-03-28HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-28SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2018-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB114&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067796
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077642
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098560
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093219
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097571
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067804
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078110
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079964
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097481
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098425

Bill Comments

feedback