LA SB114 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to protective custody orders in Jefferson Parish. (8/1/13)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to protective custody orders in Jefferson Parish. (8/1/13)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 CONCUR (#602) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#555) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#109) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12SenateEffective date 8/1/2013.
2013-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 226.
2013-05-29SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2013-05-28HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-28SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-27SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2013-05-23SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2013-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 4. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
2013-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-14HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2013-05-13HouseReported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2013-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2013-04-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2013-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2013-03-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=SB114&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833849
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838654
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840597
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851351
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857308
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838495
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838897
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847091
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846888
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846788
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850165
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851139
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833850
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839543
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840697
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=855739
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851262

Bill Comments

feedback