LA SB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to abolish the death penalty.
Title
Constitutional amendment to abolish the death penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#239) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |