LA SB109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to youth in the foster care program. (gov sig) (RE +$1,575,758 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to youth in the foster care program. (gov sig) (RE +$1,575,758 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 109 CO-AUTHORS (#388) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 109 FINAL PASSAGE (#387) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-16SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB109&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119881
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127069
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135796
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135173
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135328
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119882
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126628
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127576
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127867
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135956
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136736
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135687
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135689

Bill Comments

feedback