LA SB106 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to motion picture investor tax credits. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to motion picture investor tax credits. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on SB 106 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1123) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 ADOPT (#1126) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 REJECT (#975) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#774) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateEffective date: See Act.
2015-06-19SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 144.
2015-06-11SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
2015-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-11SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
2015-06-11SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-11HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2015-06-11HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-11SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2015-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2015-06-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Robideaux, Leger, and Stokes.
2015-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2015-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Donahue, and Adley.
2015-06-08HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2015-06-08SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays.
2015-06-06SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2015-06-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
2015-05-28HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2015-05-26HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2015-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-12SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2015-05-11SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2015-05-06SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-05SenateReported with amendments.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2015-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB106&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934107
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944638
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947397
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959379
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959868
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944252
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944745
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947248
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955555
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955431
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956564
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=934124
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944074
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945823
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946461
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947465
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945946
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948630
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960018
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947349
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957599
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959312
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959324

Bill Comments

feedback