LA SB106 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Effective date 5/11/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to workers' compensation. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to workers' compensation. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on SB 106, FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106, FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Effective date 5/11/10.
2010-05-11 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
2010-05-05 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2010-05-04 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-05-04 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-05-04 Received from the House without amendments.
2010-05-03 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2010-04-29 Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010.
2010-04-27 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
2010-04-26 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2010-04-22 Reported favorably (5-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-04-15 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2010-04-14 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2010-04-14 Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-04-13 Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2010-04-12 Reported favorably.
2010-03-29 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2010-03-15 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback