LA SB105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Gulf Fritillary as the official state butterfly. (8/1/20)
Title
Designates the Gulf Fritillary as the official state butterfly. (8/1/20)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |