LA SB104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to telephone access in outpatient abortion facilities.
Title
Provides relative to telephone access in outpatient abortion facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#1209) (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#1209) (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 AMENDMENT # 2388 BY MIZELL SB 104 BY MIZELL (#395) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#1209) (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#396) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 AMENDMENT # 2388 BY MIZELL SB 104 BY MIZELL (#395) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/17/2022. |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 537. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (11-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |