LA SB10 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain exceptions from Code of Governmental Ethics. (gov sig) (Item #48)
Title
Provides for certain exceptions from Code of Governmental Ethics. (gov sig) (Item #48)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | Senate | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |