LA SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to permanent benefit increases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to permanent benefit increases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#537) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 CO-AUTHORS (#71) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#70) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateEffective date 6/30/2019.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 77.
2019-05-30SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-05-28HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-27SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-04-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-17SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-15SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB10&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113136
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122680
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124510
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125331
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125590
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125567
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137767
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139333
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143169
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124470
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124649
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1113138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125130
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125618
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125531
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125532
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137062

Bill Comments

feedback