LA SB10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the St. Martin Parish Assessment District to provide for an automobile expense allowance for the assessor. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Authorizes the St. Martin Parish Assessment District to provide for an automobile expense allowance for the assessor. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#195) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Notice removed |
2017-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |