LA SB10 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the confidentiality of tax records, the definition of manufacturer for purposes of the tax credits for ad valorem taxes paid to local governments, and certain limitations. (gov sig) (Item #47) (EN +$57,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the confidentiality of tax records, the definition of manufacturer for purposes of the tax credits for ad valorem taxes paid to local governments, and certain limitations. (gov sig) (Item #47) (EN +$57,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 10 MOTION TO ADOPT (#53) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 10 MOTION TO ADOPT (#53) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 ADOPT (#82) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 REJECT (#65) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#40) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 10 MOTION TO ADOPT (#53) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 ADOPT (#82) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 REJECT (#65) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#40) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016. |
2016-06-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-23 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 74, nays 24. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-23 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-23 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 5 nays. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Bishop, Abramson, and Barras. |
2016-06-22 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Morrell, and Alario. |
2016-06-22 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-06-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 21. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-20 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-06-20 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-06-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-06-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 14 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |